DYSON PERRINS MUSEUM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Museum of Royal Worcester (registered as the Dyson Perrins Museum Trust ) is an independent registered charity. It houses the world's largest collection of Worcester Porcelain and is open to public view throughout the year. The collections represent the output of the Worcester factories from 1751 to 2008 and are displayed in period room settings and vignettes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £106,706 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 August 1963: Standard registration
- Museum of Royal Worcester (Working name)
- WORCESTER PORCELAIN MUSEUM (Working name)
- PERRINS MUSEUM TRUST KNOWN AS DYSON PERRINS MUSEUM TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP MARTYN SERRELL | Chair | 20 November 2017 |
|
|||||||
LOUIS STEPHEN | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Anja Sieneke Potze | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Deborah Anne Jagla | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Philippa Tinsley | Trustee | 19 November 2018 |
|
|||||||
Paul Crane | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|||||||
Alwyn Edward Davies | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
John Sandon | Trustee | 25 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Deborah Ann Birch | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|||||||
STEPHEN BOFFY | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||||
SIR MICHAEL PERRY GBE | Trustee | 10 November 2000 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.32k | £342.54k | £281.35k | £239.47k | £373.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £223.11k | £200.33k | £318.79k | £294.23k | £343.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £143.79k | £137.62k | £10.00k | £106.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 MARCH 1946 AS AMENDED BY DEEDS OF APPOINTMENT DATED 18 APRIL 1950 AND 31 DECEMBER 1962, ORDER OF THE COMMISSIONERS DATED 25 JUNE 1999 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 14 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
TO MAKE AVAILABLE AS AN EXHIBITION TO WHICH THE PUBLIC HAS ACCESS A COLLECTION OF CHINA AND PORCELAIN MANUFACTURED BY THE WORCESTER ROYAL PORCELAIN CO. LTD. AND ITS PREDECESSORS IN BUSINESS DATING FROM THE FOUNDATION OF THE BUSINESS AND CERTAIN OTHER ARTICLES OF CHINA AND PORCELAIN AND CERTAIN BOOKS AND PICTURES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
DIRECTOR
WORCESTER PORCELAIN MUSEUM
SEVERN STREET
WORCESTER
WR1 2ND
- Phone:
- 0190521247
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window