THE SOPHIA BARNARD ALLOTMENT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) GRANTING OF PRIZES AND REWARDS TO CHILDREN WHO ARE AND HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN 2 YEARS BEEN SCHOLARS IN THE PUBLIC ELEMENARY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF SOUTH CAVE, (2) FOR THE MAINTANCE AND REPAIR OF FABRIC FOR THE CHURCHES OF SOUTH CAVE AND BROOMFLEET AND MAINTENANCES OF THE SERVICES AND FURNITURE. (3) TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY OF SAMUEL JOBSON FOR THE POOR.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 07 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 September 1963: Standard registration
- MRS BARNARDS ALLOTMENT CHARITY (Working name)
- SOUTH CAVE ALLOTMENT CHARITY (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lyndsey Jane Fielding | Trustee | 14 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Marsh | Trustee | 04 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daren Long | Trustee | 04 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
HILARY LUMB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MS LIZ TROWILL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 07/04/2020 | 07/04/2021 | 07/04/2022 | 07/04/2023 | 07/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £636 | £636 | £636 | £636 | £635 | |
|
Total expenditure | £573 | £573 | £501 | £149 | £1.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 07 April 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 180 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 07 April 2020 | 01 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 11TH NOVEMBER 1902, AS AMENDED ON THE 22ND SEPTEMBER 2005 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF S74(2)(C) & S74(2)(D)(I) OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
1) GRANTING PRIZES OR REWARDS TO CHILDREN WHO ARE AND HAVE FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS BEEN SCHOLARS IN THE PUBLIC ELEMENTARY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF SOUTH CAVE, 2) FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND REPAIR OF FABRIC OF CHURCHES OF SOUTH CAVE AND BROOMFLEET AND MAINTENANCE OF THE SERVICES AND FURNITURE, 3) THE INCOME TO BE PAID TO THE TRUSTEES OF "THE CHARITY OF SAMUEL JOBSON FOR THE POOR", AS SET OUT IN THE SCHEDULE
Area of benefit
SOUTH CAVE
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 BARNARDS DRIVE
SOUTH CAVE
BROUGH
HU15 2HL
- Phone:
- 01430422064
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window