Financial history THE FRIENDS OF EMSWORTH COMMUNITY HEALTH

Charity number: 223874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £51.11k £26.36k £106.67k £41.30k £50.88k
Total expenditure £57.93k £20.08k £112.98k £40.10k £47.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A