Trustees THE FRIENDS OF EMSWORTH COMMUNITY HEALTH

Charity number: 223874
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Theodore Schofield Chair 01 April 2017
None on record
Bridget Watts Trustee 01 November 2024
None on record
Simon Wade Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Stuart Heartfield Trustee 25 March 2023
None on record
Susan Slight Trustee 01 April 2021
None on record
Duncan Cameron Trustee 22 March 2018
None on record
BRIAN HARNETT Trustee
None on record