JAMES WILFORD (KENT) CHARITY

Charity Number: 223943
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

repair and maintenance of the highways under the control of the county council

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KENT COUNTY COUNCIL Trustee
HILDENBOROUGH WAR MEMORIAL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1 £1 £1 £3 £6
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
KENT COUNTY COUNCIL
SESSIONS HOUSE
COUNTY ROAD
MAIDSTONE
ME14 1XQ
Phone:
03000 415944
Website:

No information available