Financial history YEW TREE HALL

Charity number: 223947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.47k £22.56k £13.34k £5.65k £12.37k
Total expenditure £9.02k £4.92k £14.75k £10.89k £11.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.64k £10.67k N/A N/A