YORKSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EDUCATION AND PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY AND ARCHAEOLOGY OF THE HISTORIC COUNTY OF YORK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 February 1985: Standard registration
- YAS (Working name)
- THE YORKSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David John Buck | Chair | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Antony Hunt | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kathryn Mary Streatfield | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Stephen John Sherlock | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Neil Andrew Cookson | Trustee | 29 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
JAN PETRUS MARIA COSTIMA | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Gillian Ann Eastabrook | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Anne Louise Cox | Trustee | 19 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR RICHARD WILLIAM HOYLE | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Ian Daniel Roberts | Trustee | 30 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Asquith | Trustee | 26 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gill Cookson | Trustee | 13 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYLVIA THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £90.57k | £100.07k | £70.70k | £90.77k | £91.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.53k | £48.07k | £74.07k | £75.44k | £80.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/03/1893 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/1935 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/10/1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/06/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2015 as amended on 30 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
'THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF YORKSHIRE'S PAST THROUGH THE EXAMINATION, PRESERVATION, AND ILLUSTRATION OF THE HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE, ANTIQUITIES, MANNERS, CUSTOMS, ARTS, AND TRADITIONS OF THE COUNTY OF YORK; AND ESPECIALLY THE COLLECTION AND PRESERVATION OF BOOKS, PAMPHLETS, MANUSCRIPTS, DEEDS, ENGRAVINGS, DRAWINGS, COINS, ANTIQUITIES, AND OTHER OBJECTS RELATING TO OR BEARING UPON THE HISTORY, ANTIQUITIES, OR TOPOGRAPHY OF THE COUNTY. (SEE YAHS MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION FOR FULL DETAILS.)
Area of benefit
YORKSHIRE
Linked charities
- 28 February 1985 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Yorks Arch and Hist Society
Stringer House
34 Lupton Street
LEEDS
LS10 2QW
- Phone:
- 01132457910
- Email:
- office@yahs.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window