WIDNES SPASTIC FELLOWSHIP GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and promote facilities and social activities for those with cerebal palsy and other physically handicapped persons in and around the Widnes area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Halton
- Lancashire
Governance
- 09 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHEILA ANN WALSH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE LIGHTOOT | Trustee | 09 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ANN MACKENZIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.96k | £12.47k | £2.05k | £694 | £682 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.02k | £10.78k | £4.29k | £5.62k | £5.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 87 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 December 2024 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 22 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 22 February 2022 | 382 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
REGISTERED AS A CHARITY FOR DISABLED PERSONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE NATIONAL ASSISTANCE ACT, 1948.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH OF SPASTICS IN WIDNES.
Area of benefit
WIDNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Widnes Spastic Centre
45 Leigh Avenue
WIDNES
WA8 6PD
- Phone:
- 0151 423 2692
- Email:
- WDAVIES911@YAHOO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window