ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY OF GILES HERON

Charity Number: 224157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Manage property and investments for distribution in accordance with the deed to the defined people in the Parish of Wark and Simonburn

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £21,052
Total expenditure: £26,388

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GILES HERON TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GEORGE JOHN KEITH BENSON Chair
None on record
Sarah Lunn Trustee 10 November 2021
CHILDREN NORTH EAST
Received: On time
WILLIAM MURRAY MAGOWAN Trustee 08 December 2013
None on record
JANE MARGARET KEEP Trustee
None on record
JUDITH WEIR Trustee
WARK TOWN HALL
Received: On time
ALLGOOD'S ALMSHOUSES
Received: On time
VERONICA SYBIL ALLGOOD Trustee
ST MUNGO'S (SIMONBURN) CHURCH BUILDING TRUST
Received: On time
NICHOLAS ARTHUR RIDLEY Trustee
THE EVANS CHARITY
Received: On time
THE EVANS HOMES
Received: On time
ST MUNGO'S (SIMONBURN) CHURCH BUILDING TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.02k £21.02k £21.18k £25.74k £21.05k
Total expenditure £12.77k £13.79k £12.97k £21.70k £26.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 20 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 22 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 05 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Walwick Farm
Humshaugh
HEXHAM
NE46 4BJ
Phone:
01434681203
Website:

No information available