HEMINGBROUGH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 224203
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide assistance to the lawful beneficiaries described in the Governing Document by the outdated but legal term of "the Poor of Hemingbrough Parish"

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £340
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 March 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HEMINGBOROUGH UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
  • UNITED CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN G SENIOR Chair
None on record
Christopher Swift Trustee 01 January 2018
None on record
KENNETH MCCANN Trustee 06 March 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £340 £340 £340 £340 £340
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 04 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 15 NOVEMBER 1918
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HEMINGBOROUGH
Registration history
  • 17 March 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
TREVERVEN
BACK LANE
HEMINGBROUGH
SELBY
YO8 6QP
Phone:
01757 638539
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available