SAMPLE'S AND TAYLOR'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support for children below school age within the Beverley area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 December 1981: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Walker | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
KEITH BROADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOAN SYKES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Chris Danter | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £612 | £485 | £681 | £882 | £771 | |
|
Total expenditure | £698 | £0 | £0 | £200 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 05 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 15 DECEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE RELIEF IN NEED OF EXPECTANT AND NURSING MOTHERS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (2) FOR THE RELIEF IN NEED OF CHILDREN OF PRE-SCHOOL AGE AND THEIR MOTHERS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
FORMER BOROUGH OF BEVERLEY AS CONSTITUTED ON 7 MARCH 1952
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 CROWTHER CLOSE
BEVERLEY
HU17 9PH
- Phone:
- 01482862611
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window