HALIFAX SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer sight loss specific information, support, advice and specialist equipment in our extensive sight centre to promote the independence of people with sight loss. We also have social groups in Brighouse and Halifax, regular Zoom groups, Tenpin bowling group, Local Eating Out Group (LEO), volunteering opportunities, AVIATORS scheme, newsletter and audio magazine, occasional day trips & more.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Calderdale
Governance
- 04 February 1964: Standard registration
- 16 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.43k | £174.03k | £86.52k | £172.52k | £172.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.31k | £140.94k | £118.53k | £152.04k | £152.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES FOUNDED IN 1888 AS AMENDED 12 APRIL 1921, 13 JUNE 1973, 10 AUGUST 1994 AND 9 AUGUST 1995.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE REGISTERED AS BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED RESIDENT WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES OR ASSISTANCE WHETHER PRACTICAL, FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE TO SUCH PERSONS, AND TO DO SUCH OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS SHALL BE CONDUCTIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THE SOCIET'S AIMS AND OBJECTIVES.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF CALDERDALE (EXCLUDING THE AREA COVERED BY THE TODMORDEN SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND)
Linked charities
- 04 February 1964 : Standard registration
- 16 February 2022 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window