FOXTON DISPENSARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing material assistance to referred applicants residing in the borough of Blackpool and Poulton-le-Fylde. Applicants need to be on prescribed medication, disabled or infirm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Blackpool
- Lancashire
Governance
- 19 November 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AUDREY PATRICIA MCLENNAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL JOHN MORRIS | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Holmes | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Conifey | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE McKAY | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALICIA GRANT | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.07k | £19.75k | £22.96k | £26.53k | £35.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.41k | £18.59k | £21.69k | £26.95k | £34.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 6 MAY 1880 AND SCHEME OF THE 4 AUGUST 1967
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN A MEDICAL DISPENSARY FOR PROVIDING POOR PEOPLE RESIDING WITHIN THE PARISH OF POULTON-LE-FYLDE AND WITHIN THE MUNICIPAL BOUNDARY OF THE BOROUGH OF BLACKPOOL WITH MEDICAL ADVICE AND ATTENDANCE AND MEDICINES. IF AND IN SO FAR AS IN ANY YEAR THE CLEAR INCOME OF THE CHARITY IS NOT REQUIRED FOR THE ABOVE PURPOSES THE SAME MAY BE APPLIED BY THE TRUSTEES IN RELIEVING IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES WHICH ARE CALCULATED TO ALLEVIATE THE SUFFERING OR ASSIST THE RECOVERY OF SUCH PERSONS IN SUCH CASES, BUT ARE NOT READILY AVAILABLE TO THEM FROM OTHER SOURCES
Area of benefit
POULTON LE FYLDE AND BLACKPOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 227
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
FY8 9BJ
- Phone:
- 07799036188
- Email:
- clerk@foxtoncharity.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window