Register of Charities - The Charity Commission PROCEEDS OF SALE OF TRUST PROPERTY (DEED DATED 1 MARCH 1885)
Charity number: 258112-2
Removed charity
Governing document
DEED DATED 1 MARCH 1887
Charitable objects
SUCH RELIGIOUS PURPOSES NOT TENDING TO THE PROMULGATION OF DOCTRINES INCONSISTENT WITH THOSE SET FORTH IN THE SCHEDULE OF THE LEASE OF 9 MARCH 1885.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 10 June 1969: Standard registration
- 17 March 1975: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.