HYMAN WINSTONE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 224442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We make grants to registered charities only.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £19,446
Total expenditure: £18,701

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley
  • Doncaster
  • Rotherham
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 January 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Wake Smith Trust Corporation Limited Trustee 28 October 2024
None on record
DAVID HENRY GEE Trustee
THURCROFT CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £18.70k £16.29k £17.45k £19.51k £19.45k
Total expenditure £25.89k £19.44k £17.76k £18.06k £18.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 17 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 18 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 February 2022 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Wake Smith
No. 1 Velocity
2 Tenter Street
Sheffield
S1 4BY
Phone:
01142666660
Website:

No information available