THE SOUTHPORT AND BIRKDALE PROVIDENT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of Hardship, Need and Distress amongst the residents of Sefton MBC.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sefton
Governance
- 17 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoffrey McNicol | Chair | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Peter Woodroffe | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Derek Steven Roberts | Trustee | 29 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA DAVIES | Trustee | 02 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN CATHERINE CROOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREA SAUNDRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES DENNIS O'HARA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.11k | £27.14k | £27.99k | £29.06k | £29.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.19k | £27.11k | £28.70k | £26.57k | £29.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 7 MARCH 1977 AND 23 MARCH 1989
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF SEFTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
84 LEXTON DRIVE
SOUTHPORT
PR9 8QW
- Phone:
- 01704214023
- Email:
- sandbprov@mail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window