RSPCA Lincolnshire Mid, North East & Lincoln Branch

Charity number: 224482
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity is engaged in the promotion of kindness and prevention of cruelty to animals by actively seeking convictions against offenders committing cruelty to animals. In addition the charity seeks to re home as many homeless animals as possible within the Mid Lincolnshire area. The charity is also committed to a non destruct policy.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £380,061
Total expenditure: £264,128

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 August 1963: Standard registration
  • 03 January 2025: Funds received from 223679 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RSPCA LINCOLNSHIRE MID AND LINCOLN BRANCH (Working name)
  • RSPCA Lincs Mid, NE & Lincoln (Working name)
  • ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID AND LINCOLN BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA - MID-LINCOLNSHIRE BRANCH (Previous name)
  • RSPCA LINCOLNSHIRE MID AND LINCOLN BRANCH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sophie Jane Easteal Chair 23 January 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Helena Rosemary Norton Trustee 17 December 2024
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Gwendoline Coleman Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
Preston Keeling Trustee 27 July 2022
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Debra Bradbury Trustee 05 May 2020
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Rachel Wilson Trustee 08 April 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Joanna Clegg Trustee 04 March 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
MISS Dawn Fritzsche Trustee 18 June 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Lewis Harry Trustee 18 June 2018
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Carla Jones Trustee 22 February 2016
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Penny Kemp Trustee 19 December 2013
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered
Amy Farrell Trustee 07 November 2013
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE MID, NORTH EAST & LINCOLN BRANCH CIO
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £230.55k £174.81k £249.32k £289.24k £380.06k
Total expenditure £240.91k £165.34k £227.15k £255.37k £264.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £57.23k £41.12k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 01 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LINCOLN ANIMAL WELFARE CENTRE
ST MARKS CHURCH HALL
ST MARKS STREET
LINCOLN
LN5 7BA
Phone:
01522544862