POOR'S LAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty and other payments to benefit the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 20 February 1964: Standard registration
- BUTTERFIELD DOLE (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adam Francis Sadler | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Tom Ringland | Trustee | 17 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE SADLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID NEIL SADLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £400 | £400 | £400 | £400 | £400 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £400 | £0 | £860 | £400 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 23 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PRINTED VOLUME AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 MAY 2022
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS IN THORALBY BY: 1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THORALBY NOT RECEIVING REGULAR PAROCHIAL RELIEF BY MAKING GRANTS OR PROVIDING/PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES 2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH 3. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE
Area of benefit
THORALBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 WINCHESTER WAY
DARLINGTON
DL1 2UU
- Phone:
- 01325284672
- Email:
- butterfield.dole@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window