THE HULL CORN TRADE GUILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Offers financial support to those who are connected to the corn and feed trade and associated industries based in and around the Yorkshire region. Assistance is available for people of all ages by means of one-off grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of York
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
- North East Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 27 January 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Ruth Hoff | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Barker | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charles I'Anson | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Charles Shouksmith | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Alexander Millar | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert David Mackay | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Sosa Garcia | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Harry James Todhunter | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Adam Tickle | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Woodall | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Angela Sutherby | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Tobin Parker | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93 | £1.80k | £158 | £182 | £308 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.04k | £800 | £750 | £3.37k | £4.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 16/3/1898
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE, EITHER BY DONATIONS, LOANS, OR OTHERWISE, THE NECESSITOUS MEMBERS THEREOF (WHO HAVE BEEN ENGAGED IN THE CORN TRADE OF HULL) ALSO THEIR WIVES, WIDOWS, CHILDREN OR RELATIVES; AND 2. TO EXTEND THE BENEFITS THEREOF TO OTHER NECESSITOUS PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN MEMBERS OF THE HULL CORN TRADE GUILD, ALSO TO THEIR WIVES, WIDOWS, CHILDREN OR RELATIVES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Market Weighton Business Centre
York Road
Market Weighton
YORK
YO43 3GL
- Phone:
- 07393 495641
- Email:
- info@hcfta.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window