JOSEPH CROSSLEY'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of sheltered housing for elderly people in specified circumstances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Calderdale
Governance
- 30 December 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Brunton Boyd | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stella Christie | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Edward Price | Trustee | 09 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Peter Bowerman | Trustee | 13 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leah Mullin | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALAN KENDALL | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANET KENDALL | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAGS ARCHER | Trustee | 12 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
ATHEL PRICE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109.78k | £101.39k | £119.01k | £127.75k | £153.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £137.55k | £113.73k | £117.61k | £152.58k | £118.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 21 MAY 1973 as amended on 09 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF NOT LESS THAN 60 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE REGULAR ATTENDERS AT SERVICES OF A PROTESTANT CHURCH HOLDING THE DOCTRINE OF THE HOLY TRINITY AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSMEOPLE AND IN OR TOWARDS THE MAINTENANCE OF SERVICES IN THE CHAPEL. PAYMENT AT THE TRUSTEES DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME OF A SUM TO THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE CROSSLEY AND PORTER ORPHAN HOME AND SCHOOL.AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL MEAN THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF HALIFAX AND THAT PART OF THE AREA OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF HALIFAX WHICH LIES OUTSIDE THE COUNTY BOROUGH.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECT
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 South Royd Avenue
HALIFAX
West Yorkshire
HX3 0BL
- Phone:
- 07772360945
- Email:
- heathtreasurer@gmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window