Accounts and annual returns JOSHUA HORNER (FOR POOR OF SALEM METHODIST CHURCH)

Charity number: 224672
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2014 12 June 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2013 12 June 2014 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not Required