Financial history LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF HALIFAX HOSPITALS

Charity number: 224681
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £14.46k £8.74k £7.50k £10.97k £12.92k
Total expenditure £20.34k £8.04k £2.37k £7.70k £17.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A