ROCKCLIFFE COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A hall located at the entrance to Rockcliffe Village offering facilities for a range of activities. These include one off bookings for parties, weddings, village and family events, coffee mornings, table top sales, together with regular bookings for classes such as dancing, baby play events, other fitness and indoor sports for adults, school events, art and dog training classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £2,300 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 10 October 1963: Standard registration
- ROCKCLIFFE MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
IAN BROWN | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Angela Johnston | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Moss | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Park | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Rinnerthaler | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Taylor | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.96k | £32.79k | £22.73k | £27.48k | £28.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.21k | £57.65k | £22.22k | £26.66k | £24.01k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | £482 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £20.53k | N/A | £482 | £2.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 02 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 July 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 July 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14/05/1969 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/11/2013
Charitable objects
TO BE USED FOR LOCAL ACTIVITIES FOR THE WELFARE OF AND AS A CENTRE FOR THE INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL NEEDS OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ROCKCLIFFE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ROCKCLIFFE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rockcliffe Community Centre
Rockcliffe
CARLISLE
CA6 4AA
- Phone:
- 07867522455
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window