Trustees WINCHESTER AND DISTRICT SCOPE
Charity number: 224714

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHERYL HONEYCOMBE Chair | Chair | 12 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Nick Kimber | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
PETER HONEYCOMBE SECRETARY | Trustee | 15 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLAIR PADGHAM | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHARLENE COOPER | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAN SPRING | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
GILL YOUNG Vice chair | Trustee | 20 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
NICKI WADE | Trustee | 12 July 2001 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.