Trustees DARWEN OLD PEOPLES WELFARE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 224799

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Lloyd | Chair | 27 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jane Baron | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Ohara | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lillian Salton | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Frisby | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Ohara | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Frisby | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Jones | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Quinn | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Moira Margaret Taylor | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Harrison | Trustee | 29 March 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.