THE HENRY AND ADA CHALKER TRUST
Charity number: 224808
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Total income: £553
Total expenditure: £430
Fundraising
This charity does not raise funds from the public
Trading
This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.
Trustee payments
No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.
What, who, how, where
Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
Registration history:
- 09 March 1964: Standard registration
- 09 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £809 | £865 | £936 | £839 | £553 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.29k | £865 | £1.11k | £904 | £430 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 08 March 2016 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 01 December 2014 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF OSCAR WILLIAM CHALKER DATED THE 06101947
Charitable objects
INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OF SANDAL MAGNA AND TO APPLY THE BALANCE, IF ANY, ACCORDING TO DISCRETION OF TRUSTEES, AMONGST ST. DUNSTAN'S THE ROYAL INSTITUE FOR THE BLIND AND DEAF AND DUMB INSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
SANDAL MAGNA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.