REDDITCH AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of funds to aid persons in need during illness. Referrals must originate from Health professionals eg GP,Health Visitor, Similar Charity. Funds are restricted to persons abiding in Redditch District Council area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 06 February 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CHATTERLEY | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
REX NEEDLES | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH JANE CURTISS | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
SARAH RENNIE | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN MORLEY | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
COLETTE HARRIS | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL DREWELL | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.29k | £5.35k | £5.59k | £5.86k | £212.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.65k | £2.47k | £928 | £11.78k | £114.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 1 OCTOBER 1954
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SICK POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN REDDITCH URBAN DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
URBAN DISTRICT OF REDDITCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 NEWPORT CLOSE
REDDITCH
B97 5PY
- Phone:
- 01527542389
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window