Accounts and annual returns NORTH EAST COAST ENGINEERING TRUST
Charity Number: 224968
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2008 | 02 June 2009 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2008 | 29 May 2009 | 29 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2007 | 24 July 2008 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2007 | 20 May 2008 | 20 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2006 | 25 April 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2006 | 25 April 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2005 | 23 May 2006 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2005 | 23 May 2006 | 23 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window