Financial history NORTH EAST COAST ENGINEERING TRUST

Charity Number: 224968
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2004 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008
Total gross income £26.31k £26.31k £23.71k £24.95k £27.54k
Total expenditure £34.07k £34.07k £28.09k £27.10k £26.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A