DERBYSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arts/Culture - relative to Pure Archaeology - Industrial Archaeology - Architecture - Local History Environment/Conservation/Heritage Involvement with the general public/mankind Makes grants to individuals in connection with research projects. Sponsors and undertakes its own research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 16 October 1963: Standard registration
- THE DERBYSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL SOCIETY (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rosemary Diane Annable | Chair | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Lois Ainsworth | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Clark | Trustee | 20 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Anne Hardesty Allcock | Trustee | 14 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Denise Margaret Grace | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Janette Evelyne Jackson | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Marilyn Peberdy | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARY HEGINBOTHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||
Ian Hope Mitchell | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.00k | £26.27k | £16.59k | £29.89k | £38.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.22k | £22.75k | £19.97k | £39.42k | £39.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF THE SOCIETY 26 JULY 1934 AS AMENDED 5 MAY 1998
Charitable objects
EXAMINATION, PRESERVATION, AND STUDY OF THE ARCHAEOLOGY, ANTIQUITIES AND HISTORY OF THE COUNTY, AN THE PUBLICATION OF ORIGINAL PAPERS AND ANCIENT DOCUMENTS RELATING THERETO.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF DERBYSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 HICKTON ROAD
SWANWICK
ALFRETON
DE55 1AG
- Phone:
- 01773609629
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window