SIR FRANCIS CROSSLEY'S LOAN FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of loans up to -ú1,000 to persons not less than 22 years old to commence or consolidate a business.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Calderdale
Governance
- 04 December 1964: Standard registration
- 11 March 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 March 2019: Funds transferred to 529165 CROSSLEY AND PORTER ORPHAN HOME AND SCHOOL
No other names
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2014 | 28/02/2015 | 28/02/2016 | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9 | £5 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2018 | 12 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2017 | 06 March 2018 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2016 | 01 February 2017 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 29 MARCH 1870 AND DEED POLLS DATED 23 MAY 1870, 21 AUGUST 1878, 19 FEBRUARY 1952 AND 15 OCTOBER 1959, AS AMENDED ON 10TH MAY 2004 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF S74(2)(D)(II)OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
1) LOANS OF MONEY TO ASSIST MEN, SINGLE WOMEN OR WIDOWS AGE 25 YEARS OR OVER TO COMMENCE A BUSINESS OR TO CONSOLIDATE A BUSINESS ALREADY COMMENCED, AT 3.5% INTEREST, ANY SURPLUS. 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANY ONE OR MORE CHARITY OR CHARITIES WITHIN THE BOROUGH OR PARISH OF HALIFAX.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HALIFAX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window