Financial history FOUNTAIN'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 225068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £56.45k £55.62k £90.10k £57.06k £91.68k
Total expenditure £51.31k £54.00k £92.01k £84.08k £79.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A