FOUNTAIN'S HOSPITAL

Charity Number: 225068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Providing Almshouse accommodation in Linton, North Yorkshire

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £91,680
Total expenditure: £79,743

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 September 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Edward Carlisle Trustee 13 March 2025
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Fiona Hoole Trustee 21 December 2024
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Sue Wilkinson Trustee 14 December 2023
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Angus Dean Trustee 08 June 2023
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Jonny Metcalfe Trustee 08 December 2022
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Clare Oakes Trustee 10 October 2020
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Angela Knowles Trustee 13 December 2018
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Joe Midgley Trustee 13 December 2018
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Robert Stockdale Trustee 17 March 2014
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Dr IAN JOWETT Trustee 02 July 2013
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
KATE MIDGLEY Trustee 18 January 2012
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
RUTH AVRIL MCGUINN Trustee
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £56.45k £55.62k £90.10k £57.06k £91.68k
Total expenditure £51.31k £54.00k £92.01k £84.08k £79.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 14 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 04 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 22 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 18 SEPTEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
AUGMENTING THE INCOME OF THE HOSPITAL BRANCH OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF LINTON
Registration history
  • 18 September 1973 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
1 BANK VIEW COTTAGE
BANK VIEW
HEBDEN
SKIPTON
BD23 5DU
Phone:
01756752978
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available