Trustees FOUNTAIN'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 225068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Edward Carlisle Trustee 13 March 2025
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Fiona Hoole Trustee 21 December 2024
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Sue Wilkinson Trustee 14 December 2023
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Angus Dean Trustee 08 June 2023
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Jonny Metcalfe Trustee 08 December 2022
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Clare Oakes Trustee 10 October 2020
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Angela Knowles Trustee 13 December 2018
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Joe Midgley Trustee 13 December 2018
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Robert Stockdale Trustee 17 March 2014
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
Dr IAN JOWETT Trustee 02 July 2013
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
KATE MIDGLEY Trustee 18 January 2012
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time
RUTH AVRIL MCGUINN Trustee
REVEREND HENRY CROFTS FOR THE POOR
Received: On time