Accounts and annual returns FENWICK VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 225186
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 November 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 23 November 2017 02 February 2019 132 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 November 2017 09 February 2019 139 days late
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 November 2017 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 21 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required