Governing document THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF PRUDHOE HOSPITAL (FERNDENE)

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/10/1976 AS AMENDED ON 10/10/1978 AS AMENDED ON 12/10/1982 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/1983 AS AMENDED ON 11/10/1994 AS AMENDED ON 12/09/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE LEAGUE ARE AS FOLLOWS:- A) TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THE PURPOSE OF SUPPLEMENTING THE RESOURCES OF THE NHS SERVICE AT FERNDENE TO THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS, IN AREAS OUTSIDE THE NORMAL REMIT AND RESPONSIBILITIES OF THE NHS SERVICE. B) TO CO-OPERATE WITH ALL OTHER BODIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE NHS SERVICE INCLUDING OTHER CHARITIES WHICH DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY SUPPORT PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES.
Area of benefit
PRUDHOE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.