Trustees STOKESLEY TOWN HALL TRUST

Charity number: 225265

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Graham Sowerby Chair 21 June 2013
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST
GARY YUILLE Trustee 12 November 2024
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST
Claire Craster Trustee 15 May 2024
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST
Sean Paul Carey Trustee 14 June 2022
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST
Sally Atkinson Trustee 14 June 2022
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST
David Cook Trustee 09 November 2021
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST
David Alan Oxley Trustee 11 September 2018
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST
ANDREW WAKE Paul Trustee 11 July 2017
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST
Christopher Johnson Paul Trustee 13 June 2017
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST
BRYN GRIFFITHS Trustee 12 May 2015
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST
MICHAEL CANAVAN David Trustee 17 January 2013
STOKESLEY MANORIAL LANDS TRUST