BLAKES BENEVOLENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 06 March 1963: Standard registration
- 22 October 2010: Removed (Transfer of funds)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £70.73k | £79.15k | £92.13k | £102.19k | £98.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.51k | £80.62k | £79.07k | £76.08k | £59.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 09 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 09 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 12 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 12 December 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 10 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 10 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 19 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 19 January 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEEDS DATED 31 MARCH 1958 AND 24 MARCH 1959
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST NEEDY PERSONS OR EMPLOYEES OR FORMER EMPLOYEES OR WIDOWS OR ORPHANS OR DEPENDANTS OF EMPLOYEES OR FORMER EMPLOYEES OF THE BLAKE CO LTD, BLAKES MOTORS LTD AND ALBANY GARAGES LTD. 2. TO GIVE DONATIONS TO THE MOTOR TRADE BENEVOLENT FUND TO BE APPLIES FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSE OF GIVING ASSISTANCE TO NEEDY PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window