THE KING'S OWN MEMORIAL CHAPEL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Look after the furnishings and contents of the chapel
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 22 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel William Mitchell | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Colonel Andrew Dennis OBE | Trustee | 11 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL HARDY | Trustee | 03 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY RUSSELL SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COLONEL JOHN ANTHONY DAVIES DL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.06k | £6.19k | £7.55k | £7.47k | £7.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.32k | £7.99k | £6.02k | £1.11k | £1.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 FEBRUARY 1963 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION 13 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
PROVISION FOR THE FUTURE UPKEEP REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE OF THE MEMORIAL CHAPEL OF THE KING'S OWN ROYAL REGIMENT (LANCASTER) SITUTE IN THE PRIORY AND PARISH CHURCH OF ST. MARY AT LANCASTER.
Area of benefit
LANCASTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
ELMHURST
ASHTON ROAD
LANCASTER
LA2 0AA
- Phone:
- 0152432256
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window