HOLY ROOD COMMUNITY CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide for the relief of persons who were previously Sisters of the Holy Rood who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress and thereafter apply income to furthering the religious or other charitable work of the Church of England in the Diocese of York.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of York
Governance
- 26 February 1964: Standard registration
- SISTERS OF CHARITY OF THE HOLY ROOD, MIDDLESBROUGH (TEESSIDE) (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN CLOUGH | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lesley Cooper | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Elizabeth Gerrard Allen | Trustee | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Jeremy Michael Burchill | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN JOHN CLARKE | Trustee | 03 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev PAUL WORDSWORTH | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.85k | £133.29k | £53.33k | £70.21k | £80.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.42k | £137.02k | £152.87k | £201.02k | £153.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16/02/2000
Charitable objects
(1) RELIEVING PERSONS WHO WERE PREVIOUSLY SISTERS OF THE HOLY ROOD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS. (2) IF AND IN SO FAR AS IT IS NOT POSSIBLE TO APPLY INCOME FOR THE ABOVE MENTIONED PURPOSE THE MANAGING TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY IT TOWARDS FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF YORK. (3) WHEN ALL THE PERSONS WHO WERE PREVIOUSLY SISTERS OF THE HOLY ROOD HAVE DIED, THE MANAGING TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME, AND AT THEIR DISCRETION THE WHOLE OR PART OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY TOWARDS FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE DIOCESE OF YORK.
Area of benefit
YORK DIOCESE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shakespeare Martineau
Waterfront House
35 Station Street
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 3DQ
- Phone:
- 01159453706
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window