SWISS RELIEF SOCIETY

Charity number: 225297
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide relief of poverty & distress among Swiss citizen in the Northwest of England. Visit house-bound & hospitalized Swiss and promote social contacts.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £1,691
Total expenditure: £480

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JUERG BENTELE Trustee
None on record
HANS-RUEDI SCHEIWILLER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £576 £1.25k £1.38k £25 £1.69k
Total expenditure £404 £269 £390 £855 £480
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 02 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 August 2024 302 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 August 2024 667 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2 Moreton Avenue
SALE
M33 4RQ
Phone:
01619691259