THE CHARITIES OF MRS CAROLINE RICHARDS

Charity number: 225411
Charity reporting is overdue by 1666 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Income used in connection with the support for the poor and sick, also with children and in connection with the churchyard of the parish church, and as deemed appropriate by the Rector and churchwardens of the parish church, as permitted.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018

Total income: £441
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 June 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RICHARDS CHARITY (Working name)
  • THE CHARITIES OF MISS CAROLINE RICHARDS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev David McGladdery Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record
Christine Mary Bufton Trustee 25 June 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £413 £417 £1.40k £430 £441
Total expenditure £0 £1.61k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 205 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 571 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 936 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1301 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1301 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1666 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1666 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 14 AUGUST 1874
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE PETTICOATS, CALICOES, BLANKETS AND COAL IN WINTER FOR 20 OF THE MOST DESERVING POOR.
Area of benefit
HORFIELD
Registration history
  • 01 June 1964 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
15 QUEEN STREET
EASTVILLE
BRISTOL
BS5 6QA
Phone:
07866648833
Website:

No information available