Financial history COURTLAND LODGE NO 6706 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 225441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £913 £2.67k £2.86k £3.93k £2.85k
Total expenditure £2.08k £2.03k £1.77k £2.07k £3.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A