RSPCA Wyth Sir Branch

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities include fundraising, organising Animal Activity Days, giving Welfare Vouchers to the Public for any conditions their animal may be suffering from, funding the Re-homing project in the Gwent area,paying vets bills, and funding neutering and speying. We also fund boarding and fostering of animals in need of a home to recuperate in.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
72 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Blaenau Gwent
- Caerphilly
- Merthyr Tydfil
- Monmouthshire
- Newport City
- Powys
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
- Torfaen
Governance
- 30 August 1963: Standard registration
- RSPCA GWENT BRANCH (Working name)
- ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS GWENT BRANCH (Previous name)
- RSPCA - GWENT BRANCH (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID LILES | Chair | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SOPHIE BAXTER | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Debra Wilkes | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
GWEN HAWKSLEY | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
BETHAN FRANCIS | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL GUNTER | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BAXTER | Trustee | 12 July 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.25k | £279.50k | £133.16k | £428.38k | £299.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.33k | £169.32k | £229.97k | £266.99k | £393.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.69k | £23.83k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2024 | 227 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2024 | 227 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RSPCA BRANCH RULES EFFECTIVE 18 FEBRUARY 2009 as amended on 08 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE BRANCH ARE TO PROMOTE THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY [ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS (219099)], WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE AREA OF THE BRANCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POLICIES OF THE SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
GWENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 3
Usk Side Business Park
Church Street
NEWPORT
NP20 2TX
- Phone:
- 01633289399
- Email:
- admin@rspca-wythsir.org.uk
- Website:
-
rspca-wythsir.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window