Register of Charities - The Charity Commission FUEL ALLOTMENT
Charity number: 204400-26
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 28 JULY 1955 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 22 JULY 1963
Charitable objects
INCOME FOR PROVIDING FUEL FOR POOR PERSONS RESIDING IN ANCIENT PARISH OF WOKINGHAM. IN AND SO FAR AS TRUSTEES CANNOT APPLY INCOME IN MANNER AFORESAID THEY SHALL APPLY SAME AS THEY THINK FIT FOR POOR OF AREA AS IN CLAUSE 4 (2) OF SCHEME OF 22ND JULY 1963
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF WOKINGHAM
Registration history
- 23 February 1962: Standard registration
- 14 November 2008: Removed
- 14 November 2008: Funds transferred to 1107171 Wokingham United Charities
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.