CHARITY OF THOMAS HILL

Charity number: 225513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Issue of grocery vouchers to Wardle residents deemed to qualify.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £651
Total expenditure: £800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire
  • Rochdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 June 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THOMAS HILL TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER SCHOFIELD Chair
None on record
Diane Craven Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
HAZEL BOLTON Trustee
None on record
EDWARD RIGG Trustee
OLDHAM, ROCHDALE AND TAMESIDE ORGANISTS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
ROCHDALE PHOENIX OPERA SOCIETY
Received: On time
RUTH MARY TUNNICLIFFE Trustee
ROCHDALE & LITTLEBOROUGH METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £572 £595 £601 £620 £651
Total expenditure £373 £333 £396 £762 £800
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 HENRY STREET
WARDLE
ROCHDALE
OL12 9PF
Phone:
01706370287
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available