HEYS CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Upkeep of the church buildings.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2008
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bury
Governance
- 23 April 1991: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND ANTHONY BARNSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42 | £42 | £45 | £48 | £55 | |
|
Total expenditure | £42 | £42 | £45 | £48 | £55 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1290 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1290 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1655 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1655 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 13 JUNE 1946 AND SCHEME OF 18 AUGUST 1953
Charitable objects
FOR REPAIR AND MAINTENANCE AND DECORATION OF ST.PAULS CHURCH AND SCHOOL, RAMSBOTTOM AND UPKEEP OF THE GRAVEYARD
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST PAULS, RAMSBOTTOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 VERNON ROAD
GREENMOUNT
BURY
BL8 4DD
- Phone:
- 01204883109
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window