HULL YOUNG PEOPLE'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The support and pursuance of good causes for the inhabitants of the area of benefit without distinction of political,religious or other opinions but with particular emphasis on young persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 29 August 1967: Standard registration
- HULL Y P I (Working name)
- HULL YOUNG PEOPLE'S CHRISTIAN AND LITERARY INSTITUTE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Welburn | Trustee | 01 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Lound | Trustee | 01 January 1980 |
|
|
||||
KEITH GEORGE HULLAND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR MIKE NICKLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.94k | £3.84k | £6.24k | £6.32k | £6.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.11k | £2.00k | £4.21k | £5.70k | £3.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 March 2023 | 423 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2023 | 788 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 15/06/2001 AS AMENDED ON 06/01/2004 AS AMENDED ON 25/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BUT WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON YOUNG PERSONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: (A) THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS; AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL
Linked charities
- 29 August 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
6A HAWTHORNE AVENUE
WILLERBY
HULL
HU10 6JG
- Phone:
- 07836335556
- Email:
- geoff@lound.karoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window