THOMAS ROBINSON'S CHARITY

Charity Number: 225595
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Cash donations to support those in need within the parish of Bolton -le-Sands.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,322
Total expenditure: £1,032

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 February 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane Margaret Longton Trustee 23 May 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY BOLTON LE SANDS CARNFORTH
Received: On time
Peter John Isaac Davies Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Rev Peter Graham Hamborg Trustee 01 January 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY BOLTON LE SANDS CARNFORTH
Received: On time
BOLTON LE SANDS FREE GRAMMAR SCHOOL
Received: On time
DAVID GEORGE BATEMAN B ED Trustee 19 May 2015
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY BOLTON LE SANDS CARNFORTH
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.23k £1.26k £1.28k £1.32k £1.32k
Total expenditure £1.31k £736 £2.46k £686 £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
192 Coastal Road
Bolton le Sands
Carnforth
LA5 8JW
Phone:
01524824001
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available