EDGE VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 225610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Village Fete, Scottish Reels, WI, Toddlers group, Social Club, Theatre events, Harvest Supper and other village events

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £9,553
Total expenditure: £9,553

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • EDGE VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Siobhain Whitty Trustee 15 March 2023
READ FOR GOOD
Received: On time
Clive Charles Richards Trustee 10 March 2022
None on record
Selina Gibb Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Anne Buckland-Smith Trustee 12 January 2019
None on record
ANNIE NEW Trustee 12 May 2018
None on record
ROGER BRIAN STEWART Trustee 27 March 2014
THE VERNON SMITH CHURCH TRUST CHARITY
Received: On time
Martin John Freeman Trustee 27 March 2014
None on record
BRYAN TREVOR CORBIN Trustee 25 July 2013
None on record
MALCOLM HOLLINGSWORTH Trustee 10 July 2012
None on record
ROGER BARRETT Trustee 10 July 2012
None on record
JOHN AIDAN LUKE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.32k £1.85k £10.62k £4.80k £9.55k
Total expenditure £5.70k £2.60k £3.14k £3.45k £9.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £8.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Jenkins Barn
Jenkins Lane
Edge
STROUD
Gloucestershire
GL6 6NB
Phone:
01452814515
Website:

No information available